Convert 1 to 9 = 100

Convert the numbers 1 to 9 which will results to "100", by inserting any of arithmetic operations (+ - * /) into the string of above numbers.

And one more interesting thing is by keeping the numbers in the above order i.e. 123456789..

there are many solutions to above problem. if u have any plz write in the comment ......

One is: 1+2+3-4+5+6+78+9

others are

123+45-67+8-9=100

12+3+4-56/7+89=100

1+2+3+4+5+6+7+8*9=100

-1 + (2*3*4) + (5*6)+(7*8) - 9 =100

1*2+3+45+67-8-9=100

(1+2+3+4)*5+67-(8+9)=100

if u have any plz write in the comment ....

### Simple trick to remember table of 19

Simple trick to remember table of 19

The first digit is increamenting by 2 and second is decrementing by 1

19 * 01 = 019

19 * 02 = 038

19 * 03 = 057

19 * 04 = 076

19 * 05 = 095

19 * 06 = 114

19 * 07 = 133

19 * 08 = 152

19 * 09 = 171

19 * 10 = 190

The first digit is increamenting by 2 and second is decrementing by 1

19 * 01 = 019

19 * 02 = 038

19 * 03 = 057

19 * 04 = 076

19 * 05 = 095

19 * 06 = 114

19 * 07 = 133

19 * 08 = 152

19 * 09 = 171

19 * 10 = 190

### trick to remember table of 29

for 29 units digit decreases by 1 and tens digit increases by 3.

29 * 1 = 029

29 * 2 = 058

29 * 3 = 087

29 * 4 = 116

29 * 5 = 145

29 * 6 = 174

29 * 7 = 203

29 * 8 = 232

29 * 9 = 261

29 *10 = 290

29 * 1 = 029

29 * 2 = 058

29 * 3 = 087

29 * 4 = 116

29 * 5 = 145

29 * 6 = 174

29 * 7 = 203

29 * 8 = 232

29 * 9 = 261

29 *10 = 290

### find square of a number between 50 and 60

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
MATHS,
SQUARE ROOT,
TRICK
/
Comments: (1)

find square of a number between 50 and 60

for example......

56^2=3136

57^2=3249

58^2=3364

there is a 2 steps trick to get the ans

1) add the digit at the units place to 25 and write the sum

2) then calculate the square of units place digit and write it

eg in case of 56^2

we have 25+6=31

and square of 6 is 36

hence the result is 3136

for example......

56^2=3136

57^2=3249

58^2=3364

there is a 2 steps trick to get the ans

1) add the digit at the units place to 25 and write the sum

2) then calculate the square of units place digit and write it

eg in case of 56^2

we have 25+6=31

and square of 6 is 36

hence the result is 3136

### MAGIC OF MATHS

111/1+1+1 = 37

222/2+2+2 = 37

333/3+3+3 = 37

444/4+4+4 = 37

555/5+5+5=37

666/6+6+6=37

777/7+7+7=37

888/8+8+8=37

999/9+9+9=37

222/2+2+2 = 37

333/3+3+3 = 37

444/4+4+4 = 37

555/5+5+5=37

666/6+6+6=37

777/7+7+7=37

888/8+8+8=37

999/9+9+9=37

### multiply any no with 9,99,999,9999 & so on easily

example1 - 18 * 99

step 1- put 2 zeros after 18 (as we have to mul it by 99, and 99 has 2 digits)

it becomes 1800 now

step 2- now subtract 18 from 1800

ans is 1782

example2- 482*9999

step1- put 4 zeros after 482 (as we have to mul 482 by 9999, and 9999 has 4 digits)

it becomes 4820000

step 2- subtract 482 from 4820000

ans is 4819518

step 1- put 2 zeros after 18 (as we have to mul it by 99, and 99 has 2 digits)

it becomes 1800 now

step 2- now subtract 18 from 1800

ans is 1782

example2- 482*9999

step1- put 4 zeros after 482 (as we have to mul 482 by 9999, and 9999 has 4 digits)

it becomes 4820000

step 2- subtract 482 from 4820000

ans is 4819518